Jennifer Lynn Garcia
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00264 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/13/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
08/13/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
08/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
08/13/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
4
08/13/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
08/13/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/14/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
08/14/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
08/14/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
08/27/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
08/29/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
16
08/30/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
17
08/30/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
18
08/30/2018
Certificate of Service
19
08/30/2018
Affidavit
08/31/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.