Jennifer Rancher Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-00513 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 207 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/08/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Jennifer Rancher Williams (Shinn, J.)
2
02/08/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams. (Shinn, J.)
3
02/08/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams (Shinn, J.)
5
02/08/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams. (Shinn, J.)
6
02/08/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams. (Shinn, J.)
7
02/08/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams. (Shinn, J.)
8
02/08/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 Filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams. (Shinn, J.)
9
02/08/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/08/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/04/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/06/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 08/07/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 05/08/2017.
10
02/09/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
02/09/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams Case Number 88-01685, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/19/1988; Case Number 93-03115, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/03/1993, Dismissed for Other Reason on 05/24/1994; Case Number 05-13302, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/03/2005, Dismissed for failure to pay filing fee on 11/08/2006.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
02/09/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams).
12
02/10/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 02/10/2017.
13
02/11/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams). Notice Date 02/11/2017.
14
02/11/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/11/2017.
15
03/09/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 3/8/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
16
03/15/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
17
03/15/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 4/4/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
03/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/17/2017.
19
03/23/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams. (Shinn, J.)
20
04/13/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
04/18/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 156.00 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-00513-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (156.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20600596. Fee Amount 156.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
04/20/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. Signed on 4/20/2017 (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
22
04/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 04/22/2017.
06/07/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 154.00 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-00513-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (154.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20785307. Fee Amount 154.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
06/07/2017
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 11 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
24
07/26/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
25
07/27/2017
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 24 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 8/22/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
26
07/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 07/29/2017.
27
08/07/2017
Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams (RE: related document(s) 24 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
28
08/08/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 27 Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams). Hearing scheduled 8/22/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
29
08/23/2017
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s) 24 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
30
08/23/2017
Order Conditionally Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. Payments are Modified to $220.00 per month. (Related Doc # 24) Signed on 8/23/2017.
31
08/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Notice Date 08/25/2017.
32
10/04/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Jennifer Rancher Williams.
33
01/12/2018
Trustee's Notice of Continuing Default. (Ch13troffice, ct)
35
01/24/2018
Order on Dismissal of Chapter 13 Proceedings. Debtor Dismissed. Signed on 1/24/2018 (RE: related document(s)[33] Trustee's Notice of Continuing Default).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.