Jenny Lee
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00112 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
doc
05/23/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
doc
05/23/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
doc
05/23/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
doc
06/01/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
doc
06/04/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
17
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
06/27/2018
Proceeding Memo
19
06/29/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
20
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
21
07/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/02/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
07/19/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
23
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
08/03/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
25
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/06/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.