Jensen v. Safeway, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2015-cv-00010 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
06/08/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
29
06/11/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
30
07/02/2018
Witness List
31
07/23/2018
Witness List
32
08/08/2018
Stipulation
33
08/08/2018
Order on Stipulation
34
10/08/2018
Stipulation
35
10/09/2018
Witness List
36
10/09/2018
Order on Stipulation
37
11/08/2018
Vacate
38
11/08/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.