Jeremy Tarn Hegna and Tracey Lynn Hegna
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00376 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
75
07/17/2018
Hearing
76
08/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
77
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
78
08/20/2018
Modified Plan (After Confirmation) (BKPLAN03)
79
08/20/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
80
08/20/2018
Modify Plan (After Confirmation)
81
08/20/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
08/21/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
09/12/2018
Certificate of Service
83
09/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
84
09/13/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
85
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
09/20/2018
Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
11/08/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
87
11/28/2018
Entry of Appearance
88
12/20/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
89
12/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
12/26/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
01/03/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
01/04/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
01/07/2019
Hearing
92
01/10/2019
Hearing
93
01/22/2019
Proceeding Memo
94
01/23/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
95
02/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
96
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.