Jerome Sturdivant and Susie Rene Sturdivant
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01764 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 174 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/24/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Jerome Sturdivant, Susie Rene Sturdivant
3
04/24/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor Jerome Sturdivant, Joint Debtor Susie Rene Sturdivant.
4
04/24/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Jerome Sturdivant, Joint Debtor Susie Rene Sturdivant.
04/24/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-01764-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21996343. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
04/24/2018
** INCORRECT NOTICE AS TO JUDGE ASSIGNMENT ** Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/21/2018 at 02:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 07/20/2018. Modified on 4/25/2018
6
04/25/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/25/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Jerome Sturdivant and Susie Rene Sturdivant Case Number 04-05656, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/25/2004, Standard Discharge on 10/14/2004; Case Number 15-01315, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/02/2015, Dismissed for Other Reason on 05/19/2015; Case Number 15-02060, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/26/2015, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 09/01/2015; Case Number 95-07410, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/27/1995; Case Number 04-05656, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/25/2004; Case Number 09-06522, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/05/2009, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 05/08/2014; Case Number 95-07410, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/27/1995, Standard Discharge on 06/13/2000; Case Number 15-03974, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/02/2015, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 10/02/2017.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/25/2018
Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 07-06, dated April 19, 2007, and Rule 9029 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, authorizing this Court to establish and promulgate local rules of practice and procedure not inconsistent with the Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, and subject to the requirements of Rule 83 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of entry of an Order of dismissal or of discharge of a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 2. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of closing a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 3. Any case filed by a debtor that already has a case pending, shall be assigned to the same judge as the pending case. 4. If any such case has been assigned either by the random or by the automatic Judge assignment and is inconsistent with Administrative Order No. 07-06, the Clerk's office shall reassign the case consistent with said Administrative Order.Judge Tamara O Mitchell added to case. Involvement of Judge D. Sims Crawford Terminated
8
04/25/2018
Amended (as to Judge Reassignment) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/21/2018 at 02:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/20/2018.
9
04/25/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 4/25/2018.
10
04/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 04/26/2018.
11
04/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset). Notice Date 04/27/2018.
12
04/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/27/2018.
13
04/30/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
14
04/30/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor BMW Bank of North America, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
15
05/08/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
16
05/17/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
17
05/17/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Joint Debtor
05/22/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Thomas E Reynolds, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 194960.00, Assets Exempt: $ 43672.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 368113.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 368113.00. Debtor appeared. Joint debtor appeared. (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
06/01/2018
Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien Capital One Bank Filed by Debtor Jerome Sturdivant, Joint Debtor Susie Rene Sturdivant
19
06/01/2018
Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien Credit Acceptance Corporation Filed by Debtor Jerome Sturdivant, Joint Debtor Susie Rene Sturdivant
20
06/06/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and BMW Financial Services NA. LLC Filed by Creditor BMW Financial Services NA, LLC.
21
06/15/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A. Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A.
22
06/28/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and American Honda Finance Corporation Filed by Creditor American Honda Finance Corporation.
23
07/10/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and U.S. Bank National Association Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association, as trustee for the holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust Mortgage.
24
07/13/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Bradford W. Botes, Attorney for Debtor, filed a Motion to Avoid Lien. No order granting the motion has been sent to the e-order box for Judge Mitchell, in non-compliance with Local Rule 4003-2. SOLUTION: The filer, Bradford W. Botes, Attorney for Debtor, must submit a proposed order in compliance with said Local Rule. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may enter an order denying the objection without prejudice. (RE: related document(s) 18 Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien filed by Debtor Jerome Sturdivant, Joint Debtor Susie Rene Sturdivant, 19 Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien filed by Debtor Jerome Sturdivant, Joint Debtor Susie Rene Sturdivant).
28
07/23/2018
29
07/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Discharging Debtor(s)). Notice Date 07/25/2018.
30
07/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Order on Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien). Notice Date 07/25/2018.
32
08/07/2018
Order Discharging Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case. The estate of the above named Debtor having been fully administered, it is ORDERED that: The accounts and report of the Trustee are hereby filed; the Trustee be and is hereby discharged as trustee of the estate of the above named debtor and the bond is cancelled; and the Chapter 7 case of the above named Debtor is closed. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.