Jesse Wayne Crawford and Kelly Ann Crawford
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00150 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
doc
05/30/2018
Schedules A-J
doc
05/30/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
doc
05/30/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
06/18/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/21/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
06/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
06/29/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
23
06/29/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
24
06/29/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
25
07/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
07/03/2018
Notice of Modified Ch 13 Plan With Objection Deadline
27
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service
28
07/12/2018
Entry of Appearance
29
07/24/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
07/30/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
08/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
31
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
32
08/15/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
33
08/15/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
34
08/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
35
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.