Jessica Dorothea Allen
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01645 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 230 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
1
04/17/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Jessica Dorothea Allen (Shinn, J.)
2
04/17/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Jessica Dorothea Allen. (Shinn, J.)
4
04/17/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Jessica Dorothea Allen. (Shinn, J.)
5
04/17/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Jessica Dorothea Allen. (Shinn, J.)
6
04/17/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Jessica Dorothea Allen. (Shinn, J.)
7
04/17/2018
Appraisal NADA Guides Value Report - 2015 Ford Fusion Filed by Debtor Jessica Dorothea Allen (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan). (Shinn, J.)
04/17/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01645-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21965861. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
04/17/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/23/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/26/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/26/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/15/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/23/2018.
9
04/18/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
10
04/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/19/2018.
11
04/20/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
12
04/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/20/2018.
13
04/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Jessica Dorothea Allen). Notice Date 04/20/2018.
14
05/22/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
15
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/23/2018. (Ch13troffice, bc)
doc
05/29/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
17
05/29/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/26/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
05/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/31/2018.
19
06/22/2018
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Jessica Dorothea Allen.
20
06/22/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Jessica Dorothea Allen (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Jessica Dorothea Allen. (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
21
06/27/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/27/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 8/7/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
22
06/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/29/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.