Jessica Giroux
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00071 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/29/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
30
06/15/2018
Hearing
31
06/29/2018
Proceeding Memo
32
06/29/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
33
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
34
07/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/02/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
07/16/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
36
07/16/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
37
07/16/2018
Support Documentation
38
07/18/2018
Examination (Rule 2004)
39
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
40
07/19/2018
Proceeding Memo
41
07/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
42
07/26/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
43
07/26/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
44
07/30/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
07/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
07/31/2018
Hearing
46
08/10/2018
Proceeding Memo
47
08/10/2018
Relief from Stay
48
08/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
49
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/16/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
08/28/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
51
08/28/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
52
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
53
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
10/12/2018
Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
10/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
57
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
58
12/04/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
59
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
60
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
61
12/17/2018
Memorandum Decision (SA)
62
12/17/2018
Memorandum Decision (SA)
63
12/17/2018
Memorandum Decision (SA)
64
12/17/2018
Claims (SA)
65
12/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
66
12/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
67
12/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
68
12/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
69
12/31/2018
Claims (SA)
70
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/16/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
01/29/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
72
01/29/2019
Exhibit To
73
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
74
02/05/2019
Proceeding Memo
75
02/19/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
76
02/19/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
77
02/20/2019
Claims (SA)
78
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
79
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
80
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/22/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.