Jewell D Bradford and Myrna E Bradford
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00276 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
26
10/29/2018
Reopen Chapter 7 Case (Fee) (CM20)
27
10/29/2018
Avoid Lien (CM07)
10/30/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
11/01/2018
Reopen Chapter 7 Case
11/01/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
12/03/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
30
12/03/2018
Declaration
12/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
12/20/2018
Avoid Lien
12/21/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
12/24/2018
Avoid Lien (CM07)
33
12/24/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
34
12/24/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
12/28/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
01/23/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
36
01/23/2019
Affidavit of Service
37
01/23/2019
Affidavit of Service
01/24/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
01/25/2019
Non-Opposition
39
01/31/2019
Avoid Lien

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.