Jimenez v. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company et al

2:2015-cv-01187 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 188 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/26/2015
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2015- 050206. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-11833958 filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (submitted by Jared Sutton)
1
Exhibit
2
Civil Cover Sheet
3
Supplemental Cover Sheet) (ACL
3 Attachments
06/26/2015
*****State Court record received on 6/26/2015*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Plaintiff: Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, and Glenzona Insurance on 5/27/2015.***** Certificate of service filed in State Court on 5/28/2015, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/26/2015 for case management purposes.***** (ACL) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/26/2015
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Notice of Removal filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company and Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
3
06/26/2015
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11833958. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-15-1187-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached.
1
Consent) (ACL
1 Attachment
4
06/26/2015
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
5
06/29/2015
Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 1 Notice of Removal : Civil Cover Sheet by Defendants Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
6
06/29/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
7
06/30/2015
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: 1 Notice of Removal (First Request).
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
8
07/01/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Christopher Chorba on behalf of defendants Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, and First Health Group Corporation.
07/01/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX160261 as to Christopher Chorba. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
07/01/2015
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
10
07/01/2015
ORDER granting 7 Stipulation For Extension of Time: If Plaintiff decides to file a motion for remand, that motion shall be filed by no later than July 27, 2015. If Plaintiff decides to file a motion for remand, the deadline for Defendants to answer, file a motion to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be twenty-one (21) days after the Court rules on Plaintiff's motion to remand. If Plaintiff decides not to file a motion for remand, then Plaintiff shall notify Defendants as promptly as possible (but no later than July 27, 2015), and the deadline for Defendants to answer, file a motion to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be August 17, 2015. See Order for further deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 7/1/15.
11
07/01/2015
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
12
07/02/2015
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Roslyn O. Silver. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-15-1187-PHX-ROS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
13
07/06/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney J Matthew Donohue on behalf of Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, and Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
07/06/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX160347 as to J Matthew Donohue. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
07/06/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kristin M Malone on behalf of Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, and Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
07/06/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX160348 as to Kristin N Malone. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
07/06/2015
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
16
07/07/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
17
07/07/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Bennett on behalf of Glenzona Insurance.
18
08/06/2015
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Lindsey M Gomez-Gray.
19
08/12/2015
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
20
08/13/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glenzona Insurance.
21
08/17/2015
*STIPULATION re: 10 Order to Modify Prior Stipulated Order by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) *Document filed in error, attorney filed corrected document at (doc. 22) on 8/17/2015 (ACL
1 Attachment
22
08/17/2015
STIPULATION re: 10 Order on Stipulation CORRECTED - to Modify Prior Stipulated Order by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
1 Attachment
23
08/18/2015
ORDER that stipulation 22 is APPROVED, and the August 31, 2015 deadline for Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint is AFFIRMED. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/18/2015.
24
08/31/2015
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
25
08/31/2015
*NOTICE/Request for Judicial Notice re Doc. 24 by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Text of Proposed Order) *Modified to correct event type on 9/1/2015 (ACL
3 Attachments
26
08/31/2015
MOTION to Seal Document by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
1
Affidavit
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
27
08/31/2015
SEALED LODGED Proposed Sub-Client Implementation Agreement, 1/1/2009 re: 26 MOTION to Seal Document. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
28
08/31/2015
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
29
08/31/2015
MOTION to Dismiss Party by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
30
08/31/2015
DECLARATION of Kristin M. Malone re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendants Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
31
09/10/2015
STIPULATION For Extension of Deadline to File Responses to Three Motions to Dismiss; For Extension of Deadline to File Replies by Defendants by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
1 Attachment
32
09/11/2015
ORDER approving 31 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall respond to all pending Motions to Dismiss (Dockets 24, 28 and 29 no later than 9/24/2015. Defendants shall reply no later than 10/8/2015. Entered by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/11/2015. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
33
09/24/2015
*RESPONSE in Opposition re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Seberaino Jimenez. *DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). Attorney noticed on 9/25/2015
34
09/24/2015
AFFIDAVIT of John Aragon re: 33 Response in Opposition to Motion 56(d) Affidavit by Plaintiff Seberaino Jimenez.
35
09/24/2015
*RESPONSE in Opposition re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Exhibit Declaration of Exhibits)*DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). Attorney Notified on 9/25/2015 (KGM
1 Attachment
36
09/24/2015
AFFIDAVIT of John Aragon re: 35 Response in Opposition to Motion Rule 56(d) Affidavit by Plaintiff Seberaino Jimenez.
37
09/24/2015
*RESPONSE in Opposition re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Declaration of Exhibits)*DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). Attorney Notified on 9/25/2015 (KGM
1 Attachment
38
09/24/2015
AFFIDAVIT of John Aragon re: 37 Response in Opposition to Motion Rule 56(d) Affidavit by Plaintiff Seberaino Jimenez.
39
10/02/2015
ORDER denying 26 Defendants Coventry and First Health's motion to seal portions of the Agreement. Defendants will be permitted to file a renewed motion, if appropriate, by October 12, 2015 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/2/15.
40
10/08/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Glenzona Insurance.
41
10/08/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
42
10/08/2015
*REPLY to Response to Motion re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation. *Modified to correct event type on 10/9/2015
43
10/12/2015
MOTION to Seal Document by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
1
Exhibit
2
Affidavit
3
Text of Proposed Order
3 Attachments
44
10/12/2015
SEALED LODGED Proposed Sub-Client Implementation Agreement, 1/1/2009 re: 43 MOTION to Seal Document. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
45
01/07/2016
*NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm Name by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. *Modified to correct event type on 1/7/2016
46
01/12/2016
ORDER that Coventry's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 24) is GRANTED; Glenzona's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 28) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Progressive's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 29) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Coventry's Motion to Seal (Doc. 43) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff shall have one opportunity to amend his complaint no later than February 12, 2016. The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice in the event no amended complaint is filed by that date. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/11/16.
47
02/12/2016
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Parties filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Exhibit Exhibit C
2
Exhibit Exhibit D
2 Attachments
48
02/24/2016
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint).
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
49
02/26/2016
STIPULATION re: 47 Amended Complaint Joint Stipultion Extending time for Progressive and Glenzona Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
50
02/29/2016
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED the stipulations (Docs. 48, 49) are APPROVED, and the deadline for remaining defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the second amended complaint is extended to and including March 11, 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/29/2016.
51
03/11/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Shannon Armstrong on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company.
03/11/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX169595 as to Shannon Armstrong. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
03/11/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
53
03/11/2016
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss Party by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Group Of Insurance Companies, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
54
03/11/2016
MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts One, Six and Nine Defendants Glenzona Insurance's and Maurice Stanley's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by Glenzona Insurance.
55
03/11/2016
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re Second Amended Complaint by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
56
03/11/2016
* MOTION re: Request for Judicial Notice by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation re: 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re Second Amended Complaint.
1
Exhibit
2
Text of Proposed Order) *Modified to correct event type on 3/14/2016 (KGM
2 Attachments
57
03/11/2016
MOTION to Seal Document by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
1
Affidavit
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
58
03/11/2016
*LODGED SEALED Proposed Sub-Client Implementation Agreement, 1/1/2009 re: 57 MOTION to Seal Document. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation. *Modified restriction to seal on 3/14/2016 (SCH). (Modified on 5/11/2016 to reflect duplicate of 59 (MAP)*.
59
03/11/2016
*FILED at Doc. 73 *SEALED LODGED Proposed Sub-Client Implementation Agreement, 1/1/2009 re: 57 MOTION to Seal Document. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation. *Modified on 5/11/2016 (MAP)*.
60
03/24/2016
NOTICE of Errata re: 47 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A Corrected Caption Page
2
Exhibit Exhibit B Corrected Page 2
3
Exhibit Exhibit C Corrected Page 6
4
Exhibit Exhibit D Corrected Pages 19, 22-30
4 Attachments
61
03/28/2016
*RESPONSE to Motion re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Affidavit Rule 56(d) Affidavit) *DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). Attorney notified on 3/29/2016 (KGM
1 Attachment
62
03/28/2016
*RESPONSE to Motion re: 54 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts One, Six and Nine Defendants Glenzona Insurance's and Maurice Stanley's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Affidavit Rule 56(d) Affidavit) *Modified to correct event type on 3/29/2016 (KGM
1 Attachment
63
03/28/2016
*RESPONSE to Motion re: 54 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts One, Six and Nine Defendants Glenzona Insurance's and Maurice Stanley's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Affidavit Rule 56(d) Affidavit) *Modified to reflect document is duplicative of Doc. 62 on 3/29/2016 (KGM
1 Attachment
64
03/28/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re Second Amended Complaint filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Affidavit Rule 56(d) Affidavit
1 Attachment
65
03/28/2016
NOTICE of Errata re: 62 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Seberaino Jimenez.
66
04/04/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 54 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts One, Six and Nine Defendants Glenzona Insurance's and Maurice Stanley's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
67
04/07/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re Second Amended Complaint filed by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
68
04/07/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
69
04/11/2016
MOTION for Leave to File Motion to File Surreply by Seberaino Jimenez.
70
04/11/2016
*LODGED Proposed Appendix A Surreply re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to File Surreply. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Seberaino Jimenez. Modified on 4/12/2016
71
04/12/2016
ORDER denying 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
72
05/11/2016
ORDER granting 57 Motion to Seal Portions of the Agreement. Coventry and First Health will file a copy of the Agreement with the provisions identified in their motion redacted. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/10/16.
73
05/11/2016
Sealed Sub-Client Implementation Agreement by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation.
74
06/17/2016
NOTICE re: Filing of Redacted Document by Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company, First Health Group Corporation re: 56 MOTION, 72 Order on Motion to Seal Document.
75
10/03/2016
ORDER - Progressive and Coventry's motions to dismiss (Doc. 53, 55) are GRANTED in their entirety. Glenzona's 54 motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Counts One, Two, Three, Four, Five, Eight, and Nine are DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED Coventry's 56 request for judicial notice is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/03/2016.
76
10/17/2016
*AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Seberaino Jimenez. *Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c); attorney notified on 10/18/2016. Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case caption
77
10/28/2016
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Count One as to Defendants Glenzona and Stanley only by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Text of Proposed Order Order to Dismiss Count One as to Defendants Glenzona and Stanley only
1 Attachment
78
10/28/2016
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: 76 Amended Complaint by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Text of Proposed Order Order to Extend Time to Answer Third Amended Complaint
1 Attachment
79
10/28/2016
ORDER: Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (First Request) and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED the stipulation (Doc. 78) is GRANTED. The time to Answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint is extended through and including November 10, 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/28/2016.
80
11/04/2016
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED the Parties' Stipulation to Dismiss Count One, Breach of Contract, as to Defendants Glenzona and Maurice "MO" Stanley Only (Doc. 77) is DENIED. See attached Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/4/2016.
81
11/10/2016
MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : One by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
82
11/10/2016
ANSWER to 76 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
83
11/14/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 81 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : One filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
84
11/16/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 81 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : One or, in the Alternative, to Strike Count One as to Defendants Glenzona Insurance and Maurice Stanley Only filed by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
85
11/16/2016
ORDER: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. See attached Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/15/2016.
86
01/09/2017
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order
1 Attachment
87
01/20/2017
ORDER granting 81 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims as to Glenzona and Stanley from Count One of Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/20/17.
88
01/20/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver: Scheduling Conference held on 1/20/2017. Deadlines discussed. The parties are directed to meet, confer, and resolve any issues discussed on the record today. The parties shall also meet and confer regarding the dates in their proposed order and determine whether or not those dates need to be amended, what those amendments should be, and the parties should stipulate to as much as possible. The parties are further directed to submit to the Court their corrected/amended, if necessary, rule 16 order by 1/27/17. APPEARANCES: John Aragon and Ryan Skiver for Plaintiff. Sean Healy for Defendants Mo Stanley and Glenzona Insurance. Shannon Armstrong and Matthew Donohue for Defendant Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer.) Hearing held 11:18 AM to 12:06 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
89
01/24/2017
Defendants Glenzona Insurance's and Mo Stanley's ANSWER to 76 Amended Complaint by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
90
01/27/2017
NOTICE re: Notice of Counsel's Conference by Seberaino Jimenez re: 88 Scheduling Conference, Set Deadlines, Common Prompts (Text Only).
1
Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order
1 Attachment
91
01/30/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company for proceedings held on 01/20/2017, Judge Roslyn O Silver hearing judge(s).
92
02/02/2017
** MODIFIED BY 114 ** SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/14/2017. Dispositive motions due by 12/15/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/21/2018. Status Conference set for 7/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2017. Interim Rule 16 Status Conference set for 12/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. [See attached Order for details.] Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/2/2017. (KAL) Modified on 6/19/2017
93
02/02/2017
NOTICE re: Notice of Initial Disclosures by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
94
02/03/2017
*NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Initial Disclosure Statement by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley. *Modified to correct event type on 2/6/2017
95
02/03/2017
*NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Plaintiffs Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure Statement by Seberaino Jimenez. *Modified to correct event type on 2/6/2017
96
02/14/2017
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Ryan Christopher Skiver.
97
02/24/2017
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference proceedings held on 01/20/2017, before Judge Roslyn O. Silver. (Court Reporter: Elva Cruz-Lauer). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2017.
98
02/27/2017
NOTICE re: of Intent to Serve Subpoenas to Produce Documents by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
99
03/01/2017
STATEMENT of Discovery Dispute (Joint) by Defendant Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order
2
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Protective Order
2 Attachments
100
03/10/2017
ORDER Entered Pursuant to the Stipulated Protective Order re: Confidential Documents/Information. See PDF for details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/9/17.
101
03/17/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
102
03/28/2017
NOTICE re: of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Produce Documents by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
103
03/31/2017
First MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Progressive's Discovery Requests by Seberaino Jimenez.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time
1 Attachment
104
04/05/2017
ORDER: The Court having considered the Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Progressive's Discovery Requests, and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED the stipulation (Doc. 103) is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant Progressive's First Set of Request for Admission, First Set of Interrogatories, and First Request for Production is extended through and including May 21, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/5/2017.
105
04/21/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
106
05/10/2017
STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Progressive to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
1
Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Progressive to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests
1 Attachment
107
05/12/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
108
05/12/2017
ORDER granting 106 Stipulation: The deadline for Defendant Progressive Preferred Insurance Company to respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Admission, First Set of Interrogatories, and First Request for Production is extended through and including 6/16/17. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/12/17.
109
05/21/2017
*NOTICE of Service of Discovery Answers from Defendant Progressive by Seberaino Jimenez *Modified to correct event on 5/22/2017
110
05/25/2017
STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants Glenzona and Mo Stanley to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
1
Text of Proposed Order proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants Glenzona and Mo Stanley to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests
1 Attachment
111
06/07/2017
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED the stipulation (Doc. 110) is DENIED as moot. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 6/7/17.
112
06/13/2017
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Shannon L Armstrong.
113
06/14/2017
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Case Schedule by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
114
06/16/2017
AMENDED by 120 - ORDER: Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Case Schedule (First Request) and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED the motion (Doc. 113) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED no later than Wednesday, June 21, 2017, the Parties shall jointly file a proposed Scheduling Order reflecting these revised deadlines. Discovery due by 8/11/2017. [See attached Order for complete details.] Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 6/16/2017. (KAL) Modified on 7/5/2017
115
06/21/2017
REPORT of Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order re: 114 by Defendant Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
116
06/21/2017
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal of Kristin M. Malone filed by Shannon L Armstrong.
117
06/22/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
118
06/26/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
119
06/30/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
120
07/05/2017
AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 8/11/2017. Dispositive motions due by 12/15/2017. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/21/2018. Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2017. Interim Status Conference set for 7/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. Interim Status Conference set for 12/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/5/17.
121
07/10/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
122
07/14/2017
*Joint MOTION to Vacate and Reset the July 28, 2017 Status Conference by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
1
Text of Proposed Order) *Modified to add additional filer on 7/17/2017 (REK
1 Attachment
123
07/14/2017
NOTICE re: Discovery and Settlement by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
124
07/17/2017
ORDER granting 122 Motion to Vacate. The status conference set for July 28, 2017, is VACATED. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/14/2017.
125
08/29/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
126
08/30/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Christopher Skiver on behalf of Seberaino Jimenez.
127
09/08/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
128
10/20/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley.
129
10/20/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
130
10/23/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
131
11/02/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
132
11/08/2017
IT IS ORDERED the Interim Status Conference presently set for 12/01/2017 at 10:00 AM is RESET AS TO TIME ONLY!! The Status Conference is now set for 01:30 PM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
133
11/14/2017
NOTICE re: SECOND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND SETTLEMENT by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
134
11/22/2017
STATUS REPORT for Interim Rule 16 Conference by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
135
11/22/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Seberaino Jimenez.
136
11/28/2017
STATUS REPORT SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT STATUS REPORT FOR INTERIM RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
137
11/29/2017
ORDER the Interim Status Conference presently set for December 1, 2017, at 1:30 PM is VACATED and RESET for January 12, 2018, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. An Amended Scheduling Order is due 12/8/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of Court shall terminate and dismiss Defendants Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company and First Health Group Corporation. (See Order for details). Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/29/17.
138
12/04/2017
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Pamela A. Hostallero appearing for Glenzona Insurance, Mo Stanley. Attorney Lindsey M Gomez-Gray terminated.
139
12/08/2017
REPORT of SECOND AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Defendant Progressive Preferred Insurance Company.
140
12/13/2017
SECOND AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 1/19/2018. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/21/2018. Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2018. Interim Rule 16 Status Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 01:30 PM See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/13/2017.
141
12/15/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Glenzona Insurance.
142
12/15/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Glenzona Insurance.
189
05/16/2018
Order
190
05/17/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
191
05/17/2018
Declaration
192
05/17/2018
Declaration
193
05/17/2018
Declaration
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.