Jimmie W Johnson and Ruth B Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82000 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
6
07/07/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
7
07/08/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
07/09/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/11/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
10/03/2018
Incorrect Event (Notice of) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/08/2018
Amended Schedules (Fee)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.