Jimmy Roderick Harris, Sr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04510 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 186 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/19/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Jimmy Roderick Harris Sr.
2
10/19/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Jimmy Roderick Harris Sr.
3
10/19/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Jimmy Roderick Harris Sr.
5
10/19/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Jimmy Roderick Harris Sr.
6
10/19/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Jimmy Roderick Harris Sr.
7
10/19/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Jimmy Roderick Harris Sr.
8
10/20/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10/20/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Jimmy Roderick Harris, Sr. Case Number 13-01829, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/19/2013, Standard Discharge on 07/23/2013.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
10/20/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Jimmy Roderick Harris).
10
10/20/2017
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/29/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 1/29/2018.Proofs of Claims due by 2/27/2018.Government Proof of Claim due by 4/16/2018.Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
11
10/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 10/22/2017.
12
10/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Jimmy Roderick Harris). Notice Date 10/22/2017.
13
10/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/22/2017.
14
10/25/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
11/06/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor Cenlar FSB.
16
11/29/2017
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/6/2017 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. (Ch13troffice, sc)
17
12/03/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Jimmy Roderick Harris Sr.
18
12/11/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/6/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
19
12/12/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, km)
20
12/13/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 12/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
21
12/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/15/2017.
22
12/19/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/19/2017 (RE: related document(s) 10 Confirmation Hearing, 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 1/16/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
23
12/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 12/21/2017.
24
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #19; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case. Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
25
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Confirmation Hearing. Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
26
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
27
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
28
01/19/2018
ENTERED IN ERROR - incorrect pdf attached. Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc. Modified on 1/22/2018
29
01/19/2018
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Incorrect PDF file attached Filed by Creditor Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 28 Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Claim Filed)).
30
01/19/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc.
31
02/07/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/7/2018 (RE: related document(s) 10 Confirmation Hearing, 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 2/27/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
02/07/2018
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04510-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21695054. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
02/08/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 9 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
33
02/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/09/2018.
34
02/13/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Atlas Acquisitions LLC.
05/18/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/21/2018
Final Hearing Set
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.