Jipping(7) v. First National Bank Alaska
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-ap-90018 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
53
08/23/2018
Appeal - Order From Appellate Court Re: Disposition of Appeal
54
09/19/2018
Appeal - Order From Appellate Court Re: Disposition of Appeal
55
10/29/2018
Appeal - Order From Appellate Court Re: Disposition of Appeal
56
10/31/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
57
10/31/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
58
10/31/2018
Generic Motion / Application
59
10/31/2018
Affidavit
60
10/31/2018
Generic Motion / Application
61
11/19/2018
Extend Time
62
11/21/2018
Extend Time
63
12/03/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
64
12/03/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
65
12/06/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
12/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
12/18/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
67
12/21/2018
Case Status Report
68
12/31/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.