Joe Fred Osborne
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2014-bk-00078 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
73
08/24/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
74
08/24/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
09/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
09/25/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
76
11/20/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
77
11/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
78
11/20/2018
Certificate of Service
11/21/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
12/07/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
12/12/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
12/13/2018
Hearing
81
12/19/2018
Proceeding Memo
82
12/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
83
01/31/2019
Proceeding Memo
84
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
85
03/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
86
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
87
04/01/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
04/01/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
89
05/09/2019
Proceeding Memo
90
05/09/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.