Joe Hines
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82070 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
07/14/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
45
10/10/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
54
10/16/2018
Approving
64
01/17/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
65
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.