John A Germain
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00284 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
08/30/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
08/30/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/30/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
08/30/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/31/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
9
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
09/13/2018
Extend Time
09/17/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
09/18/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
09/19/2018
Extend Time
17
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/02/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
20
10/03/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
21
10/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
10/14/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/14/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
10/18/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
24
10/19/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
25
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
10/23/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.