John B Jernigan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81489 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments
doc
05/25/2018
Matrix Filed
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
56
09/20/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
57
09/20/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
67
10/18/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.