John Carey Holmquist
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00314 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
09/21/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
09/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
09/21/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
5
09/21/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
09/21/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
7
09/21/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
09/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
09/22/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
09/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
09/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
09/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
09/24/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
09/24/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
10/01/2018
Request for Special Notice
15
10/08/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
16
10/09/2018
Notice Request
10/09/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/18/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
18
10/18/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
10/18/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/19/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
10/30/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/09/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
21
11/09/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
22
11/09/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
23
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
12/06/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
25
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
28
12/14/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
29
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
30
12/14/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
31
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
33
12/17/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
34
12/18/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
35
12/20/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
36
12/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
37
12/20/2018
Certificate of Service
12/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
12/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
12/26/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
01/15/2019
Certificate of No Objection
40
01/15/2019
Certificate of Service
41
01/16/2019
Relief from Stay
01/16/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/24/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.