John Eby
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00124 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
06/22/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
14
06/25/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing
15
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
17
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
18
07/20/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
19
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
07/31/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
21
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/03/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.