John Gregory Kellogg
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00018 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/18/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
01/18/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
01/18/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
01/22/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/22/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
8
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/05/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
02/08/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
02/08/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
02/12/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
15
02/14/2019
Entry of Appearance
16
02/14/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
17
02/14/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
02/14/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
19
02/28/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
20
02/28/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
21
03/01/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
22
03/05/2019
Hearing
23
03/05/2019
Proceeding Memo
03/06/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/07/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
25
03/07/2019
Extend Time
26
03/07/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
27
03/08/2019
Undeliverable Mail
28
03/08/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
29
03/08/2019
Amended Application / Motion
30
03/08/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
31
03/12/2019
Dismissing Case (SA)
03/12/2019
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
03/13/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
33
03/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
03/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
36
03/20/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
03/20/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Clerks Notice Vacating Final Decree & Reopening Case (Text Only Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
03/26/2019
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
38
03/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
04/12/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.