John Gregory Kellogg
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00081 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/14/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
03/14/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
03/14/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/15/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
8
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
03/19/2019
Dismiss Case for Abuse (Under 11 USC 707(b)) (CM13)
13
03/19/2019
Shorten Time
14
03/19/2019
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
15
03/20/2019
Shorten Time
03/20/2019
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
03/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
03/25/2019
Support Documentation
18
03/28/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
19
03/28/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
20
03/28/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
21
03/28/2019
Support Documentation
22
03/29/2019
Change of Address
03/29/2019
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/29/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
24
03/29/2019
Proceeding Memo
03/29/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
03/29/2019
Setting Hearing (SA)
03/29/2019
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
28
04/11/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
04/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
04/15/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
04/16/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
04/18/2019
Proceeding Memo
31
04/19/2019
Dismiss Case for Abuse Under 11 USC 707(b)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.