John H. Parker
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2014-bk-00395 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
45
07/26/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
46
10/26/2018
Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
47
10/26/2018
Memorandum in Support
48
10/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
49
10/28/2018
Certificate of Service
50
11/26/2018
Certificate of No Objection
51
11/26/2018
Dismiss Case
52
12/12/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
53
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
12/20/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
01/24/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
01/24/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.