John Kimble Pike, Jr. and Kristin Lynn Pike
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00335 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/03/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
10/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/03/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/04/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
10/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
10/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
10/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
10/09/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
10/17/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
13
10/17/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
14
10/17/2018
Schedules A-J
15
10/17/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
16
10/17/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
17
10/17/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
18
10/19/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
11/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/16/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
20
11/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.