John Marshall and Shayla Marshall
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00367 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/24/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/24/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
10/24/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
10/24/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
5
10/24/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
10/24/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/25/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
7
10/25/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
10/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
10/26/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/01/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/05/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
12/10/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
01/14/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
15
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
01/18/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
01/18/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
19
02/01/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
20
02/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
02/04/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.