John Merriman and Angela Merriman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81091 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
21
07/08/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs
22
07/08/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
29
07/15/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
07/26/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges
60
10/24/2018
Limit Notice
63
10/26/2018
Limit Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.