John O Cox
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00350 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/15/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
10/15/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
10/15/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
10/15/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/15/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
10/15/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
10/16/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
10/16/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
10/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
14
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
11/08/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
11/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
11/19/2018
Proceeding Memo
18
11/20/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
19
11/20/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
20
11/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11/27/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
12/07/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
22
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
12/18/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
12/20/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
12/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.