John Patrick Navaugh
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00263 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/10/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/10/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
08/10/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
4
08/10/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
5
08/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
6
08/11/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
08/13/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/13/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
08/13/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
08/15/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
08/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
08/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
08/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
08/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
09/19/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/02/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
17
11/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
11/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
11/12/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
20
11/15/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
21
11/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
22
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
11/26/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.