John Ray Hager
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00083 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Certificate of No Objection
doc
05/24/2018
Certificate of Service
doc
05/25/2018
Relief from Stay
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/19/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
22
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/03/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.