Johnie Lee Hudson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2016-bk-04476 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 102 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/28/2016
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Johnie Lee Hudson
2
10/28/2016
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson.
3
10/28/2016
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson
5
10/28/2016
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson.
6
10/28/2016
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson.
7
10/28/2016
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson.
8
10/29/2016
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10/31/2016
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Johnie Lee Hudson Case Number 90-06352, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/16/1990, Standard Discharge on 10/23/1990; Case Number 89-10026, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/17/1989, Dismissed for Other Reason on 10/10/1990; Case Number 93-06528, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/28/1993, Standard Discharge on 03/01/1999.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
10/31/2016
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/07/2016 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/10/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/07/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/26/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/06/2017.
10
10/31/2016
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson).
11
11/02/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/02/2016.
12
11/02/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson). Notice Date 11/02/2016.
13
11/02/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/02/2016.
14
11/18/2016
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
15
11/21/2016
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
16
12/08/2016
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/7/2016. (Ch13troffice, jc)
17
12/13/2016
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
18
12/13/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/10/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
12/15/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/15/2016.
20
12/17/2016
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson.
21
12/17/2016
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson.
22
01/12/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
01/23/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 232.50 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(16-04476-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (232.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20269179. Fee Amount 232.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
01/25/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 1/25/2017 (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are Withdrawn, 20 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson).
24
01/27/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 01/27/2017.
03/14/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(16-04476-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20468161. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
05/31/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
26
05/31/2017
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 7/18/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
27
06/02/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 06/02/2017.
28
06/09/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
1
Note #
2
Mortgage #
3
Loan Modification
3 Attachments
29
06/09/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 28 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
06/09/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(16-04476-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20799540. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 28) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
06/12/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 28 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.). Hearing scheduled 7/11/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
33
06/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 06/14/2017.
34
07/12/2017
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 28) Signed on 7/12/2017.
35
07/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 07/14/2017.
36
07/18/2017
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
37
07/19/2017
Order Conditionally Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # 25) Signed on 7/19/2017.
38
07/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Notice Date 07/21/2017.
39
12/13/2017
Trustee's Notice of Continuing Default. (Ch13troffice, ct)
41
01/02/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 39 Trustee's Notice of Continuing Default). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
42
01/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 41 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/04/2018.
43
01/26/2018
Order - Signed on 1/26/2018 (RE: related document(s) 39 No Action Taken on Trustee's Notice of Continuing Default). The Debtor's Chapter 13 plan payments are modified to $777.00 Monthly.
44
01/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Order (Generic)). Notice Date 01/28/2018.
45
02/14/2018
Motion to Dismiss Debtor Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.