Johnie Lee Hudson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2018-bk-00588 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 127 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/13/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Johnie Lee Hudson
2
02/13/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson.
3
02/13/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson
5
02/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson.
6
02/13/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson.
7
02/13/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson.
8
02/13/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/26/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 04/24/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 08/13/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 05/21/2018.
9
02/14/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
02/14/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Johnie Lee Hudson Case Number 90-06352, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/16/1990, Standard Discharge on 10/23/1990; Case Number 16-04476, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/28/2016; Case Number 89-10026, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/17/1989, Dismissed for Other Reason on 10/10/1990; Case Number 93-06528, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/28/1993, Standard Discharge on 03/01/1999.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
02/14/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent Davis, Debtor's Attorney, has filed an old Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments with installments dated in 2016 and 2017. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent Davis, Debtor's Attorney, should refile the Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments as amended, with the appropriate dates for the installments. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s)[3] Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson).
11
02/14/2018
Notes: Debtor has an active Chapter 13 Case No. 16-4476-DSC-13, Filed 10/28/16 (RE: related document(s)[3] Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson).
12
02/14/2018
Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 07-06, dated April 19, 2007, and Rule 9029 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, authorizing this Court to establish and promulgate local rules of practice and procedure not inconsistent with the Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, and subject to the requirements of Rule 83 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of entry of an Order of dismissal or of discharge of a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 2. Any case filed by the same Debtor within 12 months of the date of closing a prior case, shall be assigned to the same Judge from the prior case. 3. Any case filed by a debtor that already has a case pending, shall be assigned to the same judge as the pending case. 4. If any such case has been assigned either by the random or by the automatic Judge assignment and is inconsistent with Administrative Order No. 07-06, the Clerk's office shall reassign the case consistent with said Administrative Order.Judge D. Sims Crawford added to case. Involvement of Judge Tamara O Mitchell Terminated
13
02/14/2018
Amended Meeting of Creditors (judge reassignment) 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 5/21/2018. Proofs of Claims due by 4/24/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/13/2018. Confirmation hearing to be held on 4/24/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
14
02/14/2018
Notice to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Having an Active Chapter 13, Case No. 16-04476-DsC-13 Filed 10/24/16 (RE: related document(s)[11] Notes:). Show Cause hearing to be held on 3/13/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
15
02/14/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
16
02/15/2018
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor Johnie Lee Hudson
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.