Johnny Keith Pilkington and Amy Annette Pilkington
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

7:2017-bk-72134 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 124 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/13/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Johnny Keith Pilkington, Amy Annette Pilkington
2
12/13/2017
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington. Related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13).
3
12/13/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington
5
12/13/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington.
6
12/13/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington.
7
12/13/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington.
8
12/13/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington.
9
12/13/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/18/2018 at 09:00 AM at Room 111 Jasper. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/15/2018 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa. Proof of Claim due by 02/21/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/11/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/19/2018.
10
12/13/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington.
12/14/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Johnny Keith Pilkington and Amy Annette Pilkington Case Number 00-72426, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/02/2000, Standard Discharge on 04/11/2005; Case Number 11-70101, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/19/2011, Standard Discharge on 03/15/2016.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
12/14/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
12
12/14/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
13
12/14/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington, Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, 10 Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee Through Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington, Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington).
14
12/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/15/2017.
15
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington, Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
16
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
17
01/16/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
18
01/16/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Joint Debtor
19
01/18/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington.
20
01/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor appeared. Joint debtor appeared.
21
01/22/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Trustee C David Cottingham (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington. Related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13). filed by Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington, Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington). Hearing scheduled 2/15/2018 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
22
01/23/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington. Related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13).).
23
01/23/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington.
1
Summary of Assets and Liabilities
1 Attachment
24
01/23/2018
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington, Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington (RE: related document(s)[22] Amended Chapter 13 Plan).
25
01/24/2018
Order and Notice of Deadline to Object to Confirmation Signed on 1/24/2018 (RE: related document(s)[22] Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Johnny Keith Pilkington, Joint Debtor Amy Annette Pilkington). Confirmation Hearing scheduled 2/15/2018 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa. Last day to Object to Confirmation 2/16/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.