Johnny Tabb, Jr
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01431 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
27
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
11/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
45
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
46
01/31/2019
Trustee Direction for Deduction

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.