Johnny Wayne Devine and Collene Louise Devine
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-04989 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 126 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/21/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Johnny Wayne Devine, Collene Louise Devine
2
11/21/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine.
3
11/21/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine
5
11/21/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine.
6
11/21/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine.
7
11/21/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine.
8
11/21/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/20/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/30/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/20/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/21/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/20/2018.
11/22/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Johnny Wayne Devine and Collene Louise Devine Case Number 96-01958, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/20/1996, Standard Discharge on 10/28/1996; Case Number 01-00810, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/06/2001, Standard Discharge on 12/09/2004.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
11/22/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
10
11/22/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine, Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine).
11
11/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/24/2017.
12
11/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine, Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine). Notice Date 11/24/2017.
13
11/22/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
14
11/28/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor MTGLQ Investors, L.P. c/o Selene Finance LP.
15
11/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/30/2017.
16
12/04/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
17
12/19/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine.
18
12/21/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/20/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
19
12/27/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
20
12/27/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/30/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
21
12/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/29/2017.
22
01/07/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine.
23
02/02/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/2/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing), 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/6/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
02/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/04/2018.
02/08/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 232.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04989-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (232.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21700842. Fee Amount 232.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
02/14/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine (RE: related document(s)[2] Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine.).
26
02/14/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual, Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine.
27
02/14/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 6 of Bank of America NA in the amount of $7,970.34 Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine.
28
02/15/2018
Supplemental Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 3015-1(c) Filed by Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine, Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine (RE: related document(s)[25] Amended Chapter 13 Plan).
29
02/15/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s)[27] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Johnny Wayne Devine, Joint Debtor Collene Louise Devine). Hearing scheduled 3/20/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.