Johnsamson v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00198 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/05/2018
Complaint
4
09/14/2018
Notice of Appearance
5
09/17/2018
Scheduling Order
09/17/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/17/2018
Judgment
09/17/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/24/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
8
11/01/2018
Notice (Other)
9
11/09/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
10
11/09/2018
Declaration
11
11/09/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
12
12/10/2018
Answer to Complaint
13
12/10/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
14
02/07/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
15
03/11/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
16
03/24/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
05/07/2019
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.