Johnson v. Houser et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00213 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/20/2018
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
2
10/15/2018
Order
3
10/23/2018
Appoint Counsel
4
10/23/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
10/24/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/01/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
11/01/2018
Notice of Appearance
8
11/07/2018
Notice of Appearance
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/31/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
01/02/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
01/28/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
01/30/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
03/29/2019
Notice (Other)
16
04/12/2019
Dismiss
17
05/22/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss
18
05/23/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.