Jolene Ann Asanoma-San Nicolas
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2019-bk-00093 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/26/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
03/26/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
03/26/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
03/27/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
03/27/2019
Amended Voluntary Petition
03/27/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
03/28/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
03/29/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
03/29/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
03/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
03/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
03/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
03/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
04/05/2019
Change of Address
14
04/05/2019
Certificate of Service
04/08/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
04/15/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.