Jonathan Curtis Brink
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00217 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
07/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/12/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
07/25/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
13
07/25/2018
Extend Time
14
07/26/2018
Extend Time
15
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
08/03/2018
Schedules A-J
17
08/03/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
18
08/03/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
19
08/03/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
20
08/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
08/03/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
08/15/2018
Entry of Appearance
09/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
24
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
25
10/17/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
26
10/24/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
27
10/24/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
28
10/31/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
29
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
11/02/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
31
11/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
11/14/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
33
11/14/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
34
11/14/2018
Certificate of Service
11/14/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
11/15/2018
Certificate of No Objection
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.