Jonathan D Luna
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82261 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
08/15/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
27
10/01/2018
Amended Schedules (Fee)
49
01/02/2019
Dismiss Case - Other
50
01/02/2019
Notice of Withdrawal
53
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
54
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
55
01/07/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
61
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
62
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.