Jonathan O Hillman and Franki J. Roady-Hillman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00005 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/04/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Jonathan o Hillman and Franki j. Roady-hillman
29
07/11/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
30
08/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
31
08/17/2018
Notice of Change of Address for Creditor
32
08/17/2018
Claims (SA)
08/17/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
34
08/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
11/23/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
36
02/18/2019
Entry of Appearance
37
02/26/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
02/26/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
02/26/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
39
02/26/2019
Certificate of Service
03/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
03/15/2019
Certificate of No Objection
41
03/20/2019
Relief from Stay
03/21/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
03/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
03/28/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
44
03/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
45
03/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.