Jonathan S. Majors and Jennifer A. Majors
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2014-bk-00250 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
doc
05/29/2018
Certificate of No Objection
doc
05/30/2018
Certificate of Service
doc
06/04/2018
Relief from Stay
63
06/06/2018
Amended Order (SA)
64
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
06/26/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
66
06/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
67
07/18/2018
Certificate of No Objection
07/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
07/20/2018
Compensation
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
09/05/2018
Objection to Claim of Exemptions (CM46-COAwith)
71
09/17/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
72
10/01/2018
Stipulation
73
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
74
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
75
11/19/2018
Employ (CM41)
76
12/06/2018
Employ
77
12/07/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
78
01/15/2019
Exemptions (SA)
01/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
02/05/2019
Compensation / Professional Fees
80
02/06/2019
Compensation / Professional Fees
81
03/25/2019
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
82
04/18/2019
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
83
04/18/2019
Certificate of Service
05/10/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
05/10/2019
Certificate of No Objection

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.