Jones v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

2:2015-cv-02528 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 724 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/11/2015
COMPLAINT filed by Tamara Demia Jones.(submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115242773" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115242773','956652','6','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
1 Attachment
2
12/11/2015
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tamara Demia Jones.(submitted by Howard Olinsky)
3
12/11/2015
SUMMONS Submitted by Tamara Demia Jones.(submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Summons
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115242821" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115242821','956652','10','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Summons)
2 Attachments
4
12/11/2015
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-15-2528-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
5
12/14/2015
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/2015.
6
12/14/2015
ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in form a pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/15.
7
12/14/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Howard D. Olinsky by Tamara Demia Jones.
1
Letter to Clerk
1 Attachment
8
12/15/2015
Summons Issued as to Carolyn W Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.
1
Summons
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115250401" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115250401','956652','20','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Summons)
2 Attachments
12/21/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX166498 as to Howard D Olinsky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
12/21/2015
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
10
01/12/2016
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gerald J. Hill appearing for Carolyn W Colvin.
11
01/20/2016
*SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tamara Demia Jones: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Scheduling Order upon US Attorney's Office on 1/19/2016, Office of General Counsel on 1/11/2016 and Attorney General on 1/4/2016. *Modified to correct service dates on 1/21/2016
12
02/12/2016
CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns added. Judge David G Campbell no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-15-2528-PHX-MHB. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/16.
13
03/11/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Carolyn W Colvin.
14
03/11/2016
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript filed by Carolyn W Colvin.
1
001 Certification Page
2
002 Court Transcript Index
3
003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable
4
004 Payment Documents and Decisions
5
005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
006 Non Disability Related Development
7
007 Disability Related Development
8
008 Medical Records
8 Attachments
15
05/10/2016
OPENING BRIEF by Tamara Demia Jones.
1
Certificate of Service
1 Attachment
16
06/09/2016
RESPONSE BRIEF by Carolyn W Colvin.
19
06/16/2017
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Tamara Demia Jones.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
20
06/16/2017
AFFIDAVIT of Howard D. Olinsky, Esq. re: [19] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Plaintiff Tamara Demia Jones.
1
Exhibit A All Professional Time
2
Exhibit B Attorney Time
3
Exhibit C Paralegal Time
4
Exhibit D Expenses
5
Exhibit E Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees
6
Memorandum in Support
7
Certificate of Service
7 Attachments
21
06/29/2017
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Lars J. Nelson appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Attorney Gerald J Hill terminated.
22
06/29/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re: [19] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
23
07/06/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re: [19] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Tamara Demia Jones.
24
09/18/2017
ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff Tamara Demia Jones's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $5,064.43 pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. See PDF document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/18/17.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.