Jory Frank Priddy and Amanda Lynn Priddy
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2016-bk-00321 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/29/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
doc
05/29/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
93
06/05/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
06/15/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
94
06/20/2018
Change of Address
95
06/20/2018
Change of Address
06/20/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
07/30/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
97
08/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
98
08/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
99
08/09/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
100
08/09/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
101
08/09/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
102
08/15/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
08/17/2018
Informational Reaffirmation Entry By Counsel (paperless event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
08/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
104
08/22/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
105
08/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.