Jose R. Carter
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00411 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts
doc
05/24/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
doc
05/24/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
106
06/05/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
07/24/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
108
08/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
109
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.