Joseph G Rivera and Trina Joy De Guzman Rivera
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00103 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
06/18/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
15
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
06/21/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
07/03/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
19
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/06/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.