Joseph L. Watkins and Benita Watkins
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01494 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/23/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/25/2018
Amended Schedules (Fee)
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.