Joshua David Estes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02105 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice to File Statement of SSN (B121) and/or Matrix
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing and Show Cause Hearing
05/21/2018
Notes Public (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Order Denying Application for Payment of Filing Fees in Installments (Non-image) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/21/2018
Notice to Show Cause
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
06/08/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate
61
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
70
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.