Joshua Edward Owens
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81982 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
09/20/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
34
09/20/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
70
12/14/2018
Approving Withdrawal of Objection Claim
71
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
73
12/20/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
74
12/20/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
75
12/20/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
76
12/26/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
84
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
86
01/24/2019
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
91
02/28/2019
Limit Notice
93
03/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.