Joshua Harman v. Trinity Industries, Inc., et al
Court Docket Sheet

5th Circuit Court of Appeals

2015-41172 (ca5)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 390 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
08/31/2015
US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated [15-41172]
doc
09/08/2015
INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8005213-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [15-41172]
09/08/2015
ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:12-CV-89. Electronic ROA due on 09/23/2015. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
09/10/2015
UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [15-41172]
09/10/2015
APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. George F. Carpinello for Mr. Joshua Harman for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2015
APPEARANCE FORM of Nina Cortell for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Nina Cortell) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2015
APPEARANCE FORM of Jeremy Kernodle for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Jeremy Daniel Kernodle) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2015
APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Nicholas A. Gravante Jr.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2015
APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. James C. Ho, Esq. for Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (James C. Ho) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2015
APPEARANCE FORM of Bradley G. Hubbard for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Bradley G. Hubbard) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney George F. Carpinello for Appellee Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/16/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James C. Ho for Appellant Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. in 15-41172, Attorney James C. Ho for Appellant Trinity Industries, Incorporated in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/16/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nina Cortell for party(s) Appellant Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. Appellant Trinity Industries, Incorporated, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/16/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Bradley G. Hubbard for party(s) Appellant Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. Appellant Trinity Industries, Incorporated, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/16/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jeremy Daniel Kernodle for party(s) Appellant Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. Appellant Trinity Industries, Incorporated, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/16/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nicholas A. Gravante Jr. for party(s) Appellee Joshua Harman, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
09/25/2015
ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated for the Court to process. Date of service: 09/25/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope. [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
09/25/2015
TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Shelly Holmes, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 09/06/2013, Proceeding 07/18/2014. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 10/13/2015 for Shelly Holmes, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [8020327-2] [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2015
ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2015
APPEARANCE FORM Filed by Attorney Elizabeth Marie Dulong Scott for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, LLC and Trinity Industries, Inc. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Elizabeth Marie Dulong Scott) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2015
APPEARANCE FORM Filed by Attorney Jessica Greenwood for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, LLC and Trinity Industries, Inc. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Jessica Greenwood) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2015
APPEARANCE FORM Filed by Attorney Robert S. Salcido for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, LLC and Trinity Industries, Inc. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Robert Salcido) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/13/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Elizabeth Marie Dulong Scott for party(s) Appellant Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. Appellant Trinity Industries, Incorporated, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/13/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jessica Greenwood for party(s) Appellant Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. Appellant Trinity Industries, Incorporated, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/14/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Salcido for party(s) Appellant Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. Appellant Trinity Industries, Incorporated, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
10/14/2015
NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT RECEIVED for Ms. Shelly Holmes. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Shelly Holmes, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 09/25/2015. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript due on 10/26/2015 for Shelly Holmes, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date is 10/26/2015 for Shelly Holmes, Court Reporter [15-41172]
10/27/2015
APPEARANCE FORM Rebekah Ricketts for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Rebekah Ricketts) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/28/2015
APPEARANCE FORM of Prerak Shah for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Prerak Shah) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Rebekah Ricketts for party(s) Appellant Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. Appellant Trinity Industries, Incorporated, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2015
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Prerak Shah for party(s) Appellant Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. Appellant Trinity Industries, Incorporated, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2015
TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Shelly Holmes, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 11/04/2015 Transcript deadline satisfied. Court Reporter Discount Date canceled. (Counsel ordered the 7/18/14 In camera deposition of Dean Sicking, however court reporter has confirmed that counsel was advised that she was not authorized to transcribe this and also advised him to file a motion, counsel has not done so. Counsel will need to file a motion to supplement the record in the event he is granted in the district court to make this transcript part of the record. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/11/2015
ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:12-CV-89. Electronic ROA due on 11/30/2015. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2015
SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
12/10/2015
BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/19/2016 for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated. [15-41172]
doc
12/14/2015
UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated to extend time to file brief as appellant until 02/18/2016 at 11:59 PM [8081266-2]. Date of service: 12/14/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott, Shah; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green, Pope; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
12/15/2015
CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. [8081266-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 02/18/2016 for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated. [15-41172]
doc
01/25/2016
UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated to extend time to file brief as appellant until 03/21/2016 at 11:59 PM [8111047-2]. Date of service: 01/25/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott, Shah; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green, Pope; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
01/26/2016
CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. [8111047-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 03/21/2016 for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED BY THE CLERK'S OFFICE [15-41172]
doc
02/04/2016
MOTION filed by Attorney Mr. Prerak Shah for Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. to withdraw as counsel [8119949-2]. Date of Service: 02/04/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott, Shah; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (Prerak Shah)
doc
02/04/2016
CLERK ORDER granting motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Mr. Prerak Shah [8119949-2]. [15-41172]
doc
03/21/2016
APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 04/25/2016 for Appellee Joshua Harman. Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/29/2016 for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated. Date of service: 03/21/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green, Pope; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
03/21/2016
RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 03/29/2016 for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated. Date of service: 03/21/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green, Pope; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
03/28/2016
APPEARANCE FORM of William R. Peterson for Amicus Curiae Cato Institute for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (William R. Peterson) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2016
APPEARANCE FORM for Evan A. Young on behalf of Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials as Amici Curiae for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Evan A. Young) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
03/28/2016
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Cato Institute. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires a Certificate of Interested Parties. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. Sufficient Brief due on 04/12/2016 for Amicus Curiae Cato Institute. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Cato Institute. Date of service: 03/28/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (William R. Peterson)
doc
03/28/2016
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Tort Reform Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and National Association of Manufacturers. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. # of Copies Provided: 0. Appearance form due on 04/12/2016 for Amici Curiae National Association of Manufacturers, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and American Tort Reform Association. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/04/2016 for Amici Curiae National Association of Manufacturers, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and American Tort Reform Association. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by the National Association of Manufacturers, the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and the American Tort Reform Association. Date of service: 03/28/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (Neal Katyal)
doc
03/28/2016
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Washington Legal Foundation. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. # of Copies Provided: 0. Appearance form due on 04/12/2016 for Amicus Curiae Washington Legal Foundation. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/04/2016 for Amicus Curiae Washington Legal Foundation. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Washington Legal Foundation. Date of service: 03/28/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante [15-41172] (Richard Abbott Samp)
doc
03/28/2016
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires a Certificate of Interested Parties. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. Sufficient Brief due on 04/12/2016 for Amicus Curiae Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials as Amici Curiae. Date of service: 03/28/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (Evan A. Young)
doc
03/28/2016
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by State of Wisconsin, State of Utah, State of South Carolina, State of Oklahoma, State of Nevada, State of Louisiana, State of Indiana, State of Colorado, State of Arkansas, State of Alabama and State of Texas. Consent is Not Necessary as Amicus is a Government Entity. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. Additionally the Brief requires a corrected caption. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. Appearance form and Sufficient Brief due on 04/12/2016 for Amici Curiae State of Texas, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Nevada, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah and State of Wisconsin. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by State of Texas, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Nevada, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of Wisconsin. Date of service: 03/28/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (Matthew Hamilton Frederick)
03/28/2016
APPEARANCE FORM for John C. Sullivan on behalf of Amicus Curiae Mothers Against Drunk Driving for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (John Clay Sullivan) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
03/28/2016
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Mothers Against Drunk Driving. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/04/2016 for Amicus Curiae Mothers Against Drunk Driving. [15-41172]
doc
03/28/2016
DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion for leave to file amicus brief received from Amicus Curiae Mothers Against Drunk Driving because a motion is unnecessary if consent has been given. [15-41172]
doc
03/29/2016
PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Cato Institute in 15-41172 [8163604-2] Brief has been deemed sufficient. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/04/2016 for Amicus Curiae Cato Institute. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Cato Institute in 15-41172 [8163604-2] Date of service: 03/29/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Katyal, Peterson, Samp; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (William R. Peterson)
03/29/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Evan A. Young for Amicus Curiae Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2016
APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Richard Abbott Samp for Washington Legal Foundation for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Richard Abbott Samp) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
03/29/2016
PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials in 15-41172 [8163698-2] Brief has been deemed sufficient. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/05/2016 for Amicus Curiae Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials in 15-41172 [8163698-2] Date of service: 03/29/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Peterson, Samp, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (Evan A. Young)
03/29/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John Clay Sullivan for Amicus Curiae Mothers Against Drunk Driving in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William R. Peterson for Amicus Curiae Cato Institute in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
03/29/2016
PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of Arkansas, State of Nevada, State of Wisconsin, State of Utah, State of Colorado, State of Texas and State of Indiana in 15-41172 [8163699-2] Brief has been deemed sufficient. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/05/2016 for Amici Curiae State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Nevada, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wisconsin. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of Arkansas, State of Nevada, State of Wisconsin, State of Utah, State of Colorado, State of Texas and State of Indiana in 15-41172 [8163699-2] Date of service: 03/29/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Peterson, Samp, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (Matthew Hamilton Frederick)
03/29/2016
APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Matthew Hamilton Frederick for State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of Arkansas, State of Nevada, State of Wisconsin, State of Utah, State of Colorado, State of Texas and State of Indiana for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Matthew Hamilton Frederick) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/30/2016
Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/30/2016
Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/31/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Richard Abbott Samp for Amicus Curiae Washington Legal Foundation in 15-41172. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/31/2016
APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Neal Katyal for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Association of Manufacturers and American Tort Reform Association for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Neal Katyal) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/31/2016
APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Frederick Liu) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/31/2016
APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Daniel J.T. Schuker) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/31/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of Wisconsin in 15-41172, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of Utah in 15-41172, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of South Carolina in 15-41172, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of Oklahoma in 15-41172, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of Nevada in 15-41172, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of Louisiana in 15-41172, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of Indiana in 15-41172, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of Colorado in 15-41172, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of Arkansas in 15-41172, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of Alabama in 15-41172, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Amicus Curiae State of Texas in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Neal Katyal for Amicus Curiae American Tort Reform Association in 15-41172, Attorney Neal Katyal for Amicus Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 15-41172, Attorney Neal Katyal for Amicus Curiae National Association of Manufacturers in 15-41172 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daniel J.T. Schuker for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Tort Reform Association Amicus Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America Amicus Curiae National Association of Manufacturers, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Frederick Liu for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Tort Reform Association Amicus Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America Amicus Curiae National Association of Manufacturers, in case 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Mothers Against Drunk Driving in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Cato Institute in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Association of Manufacturers and American Tort Reform Association in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of Arkansas, State of Nevada, State of Wisconsin, State of Utah, State of Colorado, State of Texas and State of Indiana in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/07/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
04/13/2016
UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman to extend the time to file a response to the appellant brief [8158161-2] filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. in 15-41172 until 06/09/2016 at 11:59 PM [8177403-2]. Date of service: 04/13/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
04/14/2016
CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman [8177403-2] Appellee's Brief due on 06/09/2016 for Appellee Joshua Harman. [15-41172]
doc
06/09/2016
SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 06/27/2016 for Appellee Joshua Harman. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require a Certificate of Service, NUMBERED table of contents and NUMBERED tabs. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 06/23/2016 for Appellee Joshua Harman [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman. Date of service: 06/09/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
06/09/2016
ADDENDUM TO BRIEF FILED Number of Pages: 26. Paper Copies of Addendum due on 06/20/2016 for Appellee Joshua Harman. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: ADDENDUM TO BRIEF FILED by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman Date of Service: 06/09/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
06/09/2016
SUFFICIENT APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/05/2016 for Appellee Joshua Harman. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S MEMORANDUM BRIEF FILED. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires correct citations to the record. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 06/23/2016 for Appellee Joshua Harman. Reply Brief due on 06/27/2016 for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S MEMORANDUM BRIEF FILED by Mr. Joshua Harman. Date of service: 06/09/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
06/10/2016
UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated to extend time to file reply brief until 07/11/2016 at 11:59 PM [8225147-2]. Date of service: 06/10/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green, Pope; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
06/10/2016
LETTER filed advising the court that should oral argument be scheduled, attorney George Carpinello will be unavailable from 9/13/16 until approximately 9/23/16. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman Notifying court of dates which Appellee counsel is unavailable for oral argument. Date of Service: 06/10/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Green, Pope [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
06/14/2016
ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Barrett E. Pope is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:not listed on brief and no appearance form on file. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/15/2016
CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. [8225147-2] Reply Brief deadline updated to 07/11/2016 for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated [15-41172]
doc
06/15/2016
PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8224638-2] Brief has been deemed insufficient. Corrections required: for non-sequential pages, a comma and space must be used (not a semi-colon). Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. Sufficient Brief deadline updated to 07/05/2016 for Appellee Joshua Harman [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8224638-2] Date of service: 06/15/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
06/15/2016
PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8224641-2] Date of service: 06/15/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
06/16/2016
APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Jonathan K. Tycko) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/16/2016
SUFFICIENT AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by The Safety Institute. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/28/2016 for Amicus Curiae Safety Institute. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by The Safety Institute. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient counsel must re-file Appearance Form under separate event. Document has been removed. Additionally some of the record citations require correction. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. Sufficient Brief and Appearance Form due on 07/05/2016 for Amicus Curiae Safety Institute. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by The Safety Institute. Date of service: 06/16/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (Courtney Leigh Davenport)
06/16/2016
APPEARANCE FORM DKT-5A for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Michael Roy Williams) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/16/2016
APPEARANCE FORM by Dana Kirk for Highway Safety Product Manufacturers for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Dana Gareth Kirk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/16/2016
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Highway Safety Product Manufacturers. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/27/2016 for Amicus Curiae Highway Safety Product Manufacturers. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Highway Safety Product Manufacturers. Date of service: 06/16/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (Dana Gareth Kirk)
doc
06/16/2016
SUFFICIENT AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILEDby Mr. Dean L. Sicking. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/05/2016, for Amicus Curiae Dean L. Sicking. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Mr. Dean L. Sicking. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient any addendum attached to a brief is limited to 15 pages. Counsel must remove the addedum and re-file under it's own separate cover, and include a table of contents and certificate of service. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. Sufficient Brief due on 07/05/2016 for Amicus Curiae Dean L. Sicking. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Dean L. Sicking. Date of service: 06/13/2016, via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green. [15-41172] (Jonathan K. Tycko)
06/16/2016
APPEARANCE FORM Geoffrey Culbertson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Geoffrey Patton Culbertson) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/16/2016
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Victims of ET-Plus. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/27/2016 for Amicus Curiae Victims of ET-Plus. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Victims of ET-Plus. Date of service: 06/16/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (Geoffrey Patton Culbertson)
doc
06/16/2016
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Former Federal Highway Administration Official. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/27/2016 for Amicus Curiae Former Federal Highway Administration Official. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Former FHWA Official, James H. Hatton, Jr. Date of service: 06/16/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (Michael Roy Williams)
06/16/2016
APPEARANCE FORM for David J. Chizewer on behalf of Amicus Curiae Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (David J. Chizewer) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/16/2016
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/27/2016 for Amicus Curiae Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund. Date of service: 06/16/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (David J. Chizewer)
06/20/2016
Paper copies of addendum brief filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 9. Paper Copies of Addendum due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2016
APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Courtney Leigh Davenport for Safety Institute for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [15-41172] (Courtney Leigh Davenport) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/21/2016
PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Safety Institute in 15-41172 [8229875-2] Date of service: 06/21/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (Courtney Leigh Davenport)
06/21/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael Roy Williams for Amicus Curiae Former Federal Highway Administration Official in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Dana Gareth Kirk for Amicus Curiae Highway Safety Product Manufacturers in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Geoffrey Patton Culbertson for Amicus Curiae Victims of ET-Plus in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David J. Chizewer for Amicus Curiae Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jonathan K. Tycko for Amicus Curiae Dean L. Sicking in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/22/2016
MOTION filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated to extend time to file reply brief until 07/21/2016 at 11:59 PM [8235552-2]. Date of service: 06/22/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
06/22/2016
CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. [8235552-2] Reply Brief deadline updated to 07/21/2016 for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated [15-41172]
doc
06/22/2016
PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8224638-2] Date of service: 06/22/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
06/22/2016
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED Date of Service: 06/22/2016 [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman to notify the Court of a new development. Date of Service: 06/22/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
06/22/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Former Federal Highway Administration Official in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/23/2016
APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Courtney Leigh Davenport for Amicus Curiae Safety Institute in 15-41172 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/24/2016
DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the additional paper copies of amicus brief received from Amicus Curiae Victims of ET-Plus because they are unnecessary. Paper copies recycled. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/27/2016
PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Mr. Dean L. Sicking in 15-41172 [8230244-2] Date of service: 06/27/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (Jonathan K. Tycko)
doc
06/27/2016
ADDENDUM TO AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED Mr. Dean L. Sicking. Number of Pages: 69. # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Addendum due on 07/05/2016, for Amicus Curiae Dean L. Sicking. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: ADDENDUM TO BRIEF FILED by Amicus Curiae Mr. Dean L. Sicking. Date of Service: 06/27/2016, via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green. [15-41172] (Jonathan K. Tycko)
06/28/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Victims of ET-Plus in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Highway Safety Product Manufacturers in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/30/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Safety Institute and Amicus Curiae Safety Institute in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/30/2016
Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/01/2016
Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/01/2016
Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Mr. Dean L. Sicking and Amicus Curiae Mr. Dean L. Sicking in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/01/2016
Paper copies of addendum brief filed by Amicus Curiae Mr. Dean L. Sicking in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Addendum due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
07/21/2016
APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/01/2016 for Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated. Date of service: 07/21/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
07/28/2016
Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/05/2016
OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman to file Sur-Reply for leave to file document [8276932-2]. Date of service: 08/05/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
08/08/2016
RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [8277200-1] to the motion to file supp reply brief filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8276932-2] [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated [8277200-1] to the motion to file supp reply brief filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8276932-2] Date of Service: 08/08/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green. [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
08/08/2016
COURT ORDER denying opposed motion to file sur-reply brief filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman [8276932-2] Judge(s): JWE. [15-41172]
doc
08/10/2016
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED Date of Service: 08/10/2016 [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman Date of Service: 08/10/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
08/17/2016
RESPONSE filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated to the 28j letter filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8280833-2] Date of Service: 08/17/2016 [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated to the 28j letter filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8280833-2] Date of Service: 08/17/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
08/24/2016
CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 12/05/2016. [15-41172]
doc
08/24/2016
LETTER filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman to inform the Court of oral argument availability. Date of Service: 08/24/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
09/13/2016
MOTION filed by Attorney Ms. Jessica Greenwood for Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. to withdraw as counsel [8307375-2]. Date of Service: 09/13/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Greenwood, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (Jessica Greenwood)
doc
09/13/2016
CLERK ORDER granting motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Ms. Jessica Greenwood [8307375-2] [15-41172]
10/21/2016
CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Wednesday, 12/07/2016 in New Orleans in the En Banc Courtroom -- PM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
11/20/2016
LETTER filed Notifying the court of new information. [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated Date of Service: 11/20/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
11/21/2016
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman Date of Service: 11/21/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
11/23/2016
PAPER RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:12-CV-89. Paper transcripts for ROA pages13836-15770 (7/7/14-7/18/14) and ROA pages 15951-17990 (10/7/14-10/20/14) ONLY. Paper ROA due on 11/25/2016 [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
12/03/2016
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman Date of Service: 12/03/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
12/05/2016
RESPONSE filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated to the 28j letter filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8370989-2], 28j letter filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8362735-2] Date of Service: 12/05/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
12/07/2016
ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Jolly, Higginbotham, Graves. Arguing Person Information Updated for: George F. Carpinello arguing for Appellee Joshua Harman; Arguing Person Information Updated for: James C. Ho arguing for Appellant L.L.C. Trinity Highway Products [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
01/23/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated Date of Service: 01/23/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
01/24/2017
RESPONSE filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman to the 28j letter filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. in 15-41172 [8406933-2] Date of Service: 01/24/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
03/16/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman Date of Service: 03/16/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
03/17/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman Date of Service: 03/17/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
03/24/2017
RESPONSE filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated to the 28j letter filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8450106-2] Date of Service: 03/24/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
03/24/2017
RESPONSE filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated to the 28j letter filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8451108-2] Date of Service: 03/24/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
05/10/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated Date of Service: 05/10/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
05/12/2017
RESPONSE filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman to the 28j letter filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. in 15-41172 [8494180-2] Date of Service: 05/12/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
07/06/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated Date of Service: 07/06/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
doc
07/11/2017
RESPONSE filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman to the 28j letter filed by Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. in 15-41172 [8537280-2] Date of Service: 07/11/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
08/07/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman Date of Service: 08/07/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
08/10/2017
RESPONSE filed by Appellants Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. and Trinity Industries, Incorporated to the 28j letter filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 [8561408-2] Date of Service: 08/10/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Liu, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (James C. Ho)
09/07/2017
ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Frederick Liu is designated as inactive in this case. Reason: received phone call: not participating in the case. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
09/29/2017
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [15-41172 Reversed and Rendered ] Judge: EGJ, Judge: PEH, Judge: JEG Mandate pull date is 10/20/2017 [15-41172]
doc
09/29/2017
JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [15-41172]
09/29/2017
COSTS TAXED: Each party bear its own costs on appeal. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
10/03/2017
LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: mandate pull date has been updated to 10/20/2017 [15-41172]
doc
10/10/2017
LETTER filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman Requesting 14-day extension to file a motion for en banc consideration. Date of Service: 10/10/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
10/11/2017
UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman to extend the time to file a rehearing until 10/27/2017 at 11:59 PM [8610839-2], to stay issuance of the mandate [8610839-3]. Date of service: 10/11/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
doc
10/12/2017
COURT ORDER granting motion to extend the time to file a petition for rehearing filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman [8610839-2] until 10/27/2017 Case Management deadline satisfied. Mandate issue date 11/6/17. Judge(s): PEH. [15-41172]
doc
10/27/2017
PETITION for rehearing en banc [8624690-2] Number of Copies:0. Mandate issue date canceled. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 11/06/2017 for Appellee Joshua Harman. Date of Service: 10/27/2017 [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PETITION filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman for rehearing en banc [8624690-2]. Date of Service: 10/27/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (George F. Carpinello)
11/01/2017
Paper copies of petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman in 15-41172 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 20. Paper Copies of Rehearing due deadline satisfied. [15-41172] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
11/03/2017
DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the amicus curiae brief in support of appellee's petition for rehearing en banc received from Amicus Curiae Former Federal Highway Administration Official because a motion must be filed requesting permission to file an amicus curiae brief in support of a petition for rehearing en banc [15-41172]
doc
11/07/2017
UNOPPOSED MOTION to file amicus brief [8634369-2] to file brief in excess of the word count limitation but not to exceed 4101 words [8634369-3] [15-41172] [8634369-2] Date of Service: 11/07/2017 [15-41172] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION by Amicus Curiae, James H. Hatton, Jr. to file amicus brief [8634369-2] Date of service: 11/07/2017 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Ho, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green [15-41172] (Michael Roy Williams)
doc
11/14/2017
COURT ORDER denying motion to file amicus brief filed by Mr. James H. Hatton, Jr. in support of appellee's petition for rehearing en banc, by his own statement "largely duplicative of Mr. Hattons' amicus brief previously filed with the Panel" [8634369-2] filed by James H. Hatton, Jr. in 15-41172 [8634369-3] Judge(s): EGJ, PEH and JEG. [15-41172]
doc
11/14/2017
COURT ORDER denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman [8624690-2] Without Poll. Mandate issue date is 11/22/2017 Judge(s): EGJ, PEH, WED, EHJ, JES, EBC, ECP, PRO, JWE, LHS, CH, JEG, SAH and GJC. Judge Dennis did not participate in the consideration of the rehearing en banc [15-41172]
doc
11/14/2017
MANDATE ISSUED FORTHWITH. Mandate issue date satisfied. [15-41172]
doc
01/19/2018
MOTION filed by Attorney Mr. Bradley G. Hubbard for Appellants Trinity Industries, Incorporated and Trinity Highway Products, L.L.C. Bradley G. Hubbard to withdraw as counsel [8683388-2]. Date of Service: 01/19/2018 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Chizewer, Culbertson, Davenport, Frederick, Katyal, Kirk, Peterson, Samp, Schuker, Sullivan, Tycko, Williams, Young; Attorney for Appellants: Cortell, Hubbard, Kernodle, Ricketts, Salcido, Scott; Attorney for Appellees: Carpinello, Gravante, Green; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Ho [15-41172] (Bradley G. Hubbard)
doc
01/22/2018
CLERK ORDER granting Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Mr. Bradley G. Hubbard [8683388-2] [15-41172]
doc
02/20/2018
SUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [8707402-2] was filed by Appellee Mr. Joshua Harman on 02/12/2018. Supreme Court Number: 17-1149. [15-41172] (SMC) [Entered: 02/20/2018 02:13 PM]

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.