Joyle P Walthall and Patricia A Walthall
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82096 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
27
08/15/2018
Notice of Dismissal/Withdrawal of a Document
83
12/18/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing
93
01/28/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
01/31/2019
Request for Clerk to Send Notice of Filing of Claim by Debtor or Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
02/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.